PRO FIRE AND WATER RESTORATION COMPANY v. HOLIDAY PC INC
Plaintiff: Pro Fire and Water Restoration Company
Defendant: Holiday PC, Inc. and HOLIDAY PC INC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00205
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 9/18/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/18/2019. Discovery due by 3/4/2020. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/4/2019. (MB)
September 4, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #10 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim (please see proposed ISO). (MB)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against PRO FIRE AND WATER RESTORATION COMPANY by HOLIDAY PC INC. (HENRY, WILLIAM)
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against HOLIDAY PC INC, filed by PRO FIRE AND WATER RESTORATION COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint Exhibits) (HERSH, ADAM)
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by PRO FIRE AND WATER RESTORATION COMPANY (HERSH, ADAM)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by HARDY L ROBERTS, III on behalf of PRO FIRE AND WATER RESTORATION COMPANY (ROBERTS, HARDY)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to HOLIDAY PC INC. (MB)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE for Clerk to Issue Summons by PRO FIRE AND WATER RESTORATION COMPANY (HERSH, ADAM)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (HERSH, ADAM)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: In accordance with N.D. Fla. Loc. R. 5.1(E), The completed Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44, Rev. 12/12) is to be filed as a separate pleading. Therefore, please file the civil cover sheet using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings" under "Other Documents (MB)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (MB)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Holiday PC, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4547723.), filed by Pro Fire and Water Restoration Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (HERSH, ADAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PRO FIRE AND WATER RESTORATION COMPANY v. HOLIDAY PC INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holiday PC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOLIDAY PC INC
Represented By: WILLIAM SCOTT HENRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pro Fire and Water Restoration Company
Represented By: ADAM HERSH
Represented By: AJAY KUMAR SINGH
Represented By: HARDY L ROBERTS, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?