PRO FIRE AND WATER RESTORATION COMPANY v. HOLIDAY RESORT PCB INC
Plaintiff: Pro Fire and Water Restoration Company
Defendant: Holiday Resort, PCB, Inc. and HOLIDAY RESORT PCB INC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00206
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 11 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Each non-governmental corporate party must file a statement that identifies any parent corporation and any publicly held corporation that owns 10% or more of its stock or states that there is no such corporation. The deadline for filing the statement is set forth in Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, and, if not filed sooner, the statement must in any event be filed within 14 days of the date of the scheduling order. The deadline expired on 9/3/2019. A corporate disclosure statement must be filed no later than 9/9/2019. (Clerk to notify chambers on 9/9/2019). (MB)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by PRO FIRE AND WATER RESTORATION COMPANY. (HERSH, ADAM)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 9/3/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/3/2019. Discovery due by 2/18/2020. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/20/2019. (MB)
August 20, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #8 Answer to Complaint (please see proposed ISO). (MB)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by HOLIDAY RESORT PCB INC. (HENRY, WILLIAM)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by HARDY L ROBERTS, III on behalf of PRO FIRE AND WATER RESTORATION COMPANY (ROBERTS, HARDY)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to HOLIDAY RESORT PCB INC. (MB)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE for Clerk to Issue Summons by PRO FIRE AND WATER RESTORATION COMPANY (HERSH, ADAM)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (HERSH, ADAM)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: In accordance with N.D. Fla. Loc. R. 5.1(E), The completed Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44, Rev. 12/12) is to be filed as a separate pleading. Therefore, please file the civil cover sheet using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings" under "Other Documents (MB)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (MB)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Holiday Resort, PCB, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4547791.), filed by Pro Fire and Water Restoration Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (HERSH, ADAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PRO FIRE AND WATER RESTORATION COMPANY v. HOLIDAY RESORT PCB INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pro Fire and Water Restoration Company
Represented By: ADAM HERSH
Represented By: AJAY KUMAR SINGH
Represented By: HARDY L ROBERTS, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holiday Resort, PCB, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOLIDAY RESORT PCB INC
Represented By: WILLIAM SCOTT HENRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?