JOHNSON et al v. LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: JACKIE JOHNSON and BONNIE JOHNSON
Defendant: LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 5:2019cv00214
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Other Affiliate AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC., Other Affiliate AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc., Other Affiliate AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY INC for LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY.. (MURPHY, EUGENE)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 8/6/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/5/2019. Discovery due by 1/21/2020. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/23/2019. (alb)
July 23, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal. (See proposed ISO.) (alb)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by STUART BARRY YANOFSKY on behalf of BONNIE JOHNSON, JACKIE JOHNSON (YANOFSKY, STUART)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF SIMILAR CASE by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY (MURPHY, EUGENE)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (MURPHY, EUGENE)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT for ASHLEY L WHEELER. (MB)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE for ASHLEY L WHEELER. (MB)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY from Circuit Court of the 14th Judicial Circuit, case number 19000229CAAXMX. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4550161.), filed by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (MURPHY, EUGENE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOHNSON et al v. LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACKIE JOHNSON
Represented By: STUART BARRY YANOFSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BONNIE JOHNSON
Represented By: STUART BARRY YANOFSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: EUGENE P MURPHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?