COMBS et al v. AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP
Plaintiff: April Combs, Monesia Brown, Junious Brown and Bert Combs
Defendant: AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00269
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:4001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER re #9 Joint Report. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 3/24/2020. Discovery due by 3/3/2020. Mediation to take place by 3/24/2020. Mediation Report due by 4/7/2020. Bench Trial set for 10/26/2020. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 10/7/2019. (sdw)
October 4, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #9 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (sdw)
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by DAMIAN SCOTT SULLIVENT on behalf of JUNIOUS BROWN, MONESIA BROWN, APRIL COMBS, BERT COMBS (SULLIVENT, DAMIAN)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by AMY D BOGGS on behalf of JUNIOUS BROWN, MONESIA BROWN, APRIL COMBS, BERT COMBS (BOGGS, AMY)
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (PENNEKAMP, JOHN)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN MICHAEL PENNEKAMP on behalf of AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP. (PENNEKAMP, JOHN)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 9/18/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/18/2019. Discovery due by 1/2/2020. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 9/4/2019. (sdw)
September 4, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #5 Answer to Complaint. (please see proposed ISO) (sdw)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP. identifying Corporate Parent THE PROGRESSIVE CORPORATION, Corporate Parent ARX HOLDING CORPORATION, Corporate Parent ARX Executive Holdings, LLLP for AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP... (DETWEILER, KEITH)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP.. (DETWEILER, KEITH)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MONESIA BROWN, APRIL COMBS, BERT COMBS, JUNIOUS BROWN. AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP. served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (BOGGS, AMY)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP. (sdw)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE Summons to be Issued by Junious Brown, Monesia Brown, April Combs, Bert Combs re #1 Complaint (BOGGS, AMY)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4584246.), filed by Bert Combs, Monesia Brown, Junious Brown, April Combs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (BOGGS, AMY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COMBS et al v. AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP.
Represented By: KEITH MICHAEL DETWEILER
Represented By: JOHN MICHAEL PENNEKAMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Combs
Represented By: AMY D BOGGS
Represented By: DAMIAN SCOTT SULLIVENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monesia Brown
Represented By: AMY D BOGGS
Represented By: DAMIAN SCOTT SULLIVENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Junious Brown
Represented By: AMY D BOGGS
Represented By: DAMIAN SCOTT SULLIVENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bert Combs
Represented By: AMY D BOGGS
Represented By: DAMIAN SCOTT SULLIVENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?