O'Tyson et al v. LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: Jeanne O'Tyson and Jack O'Tyson
Defendant: LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 5:2019cv00305
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER re #6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Discovery due by 6/19/2020. Dispositive and Daubert Motions to be filed by 6/19/2020. Mediation to take place by 5/29/2020. Mediation Report due by 6/12/2020. A Jury Trial in this case is set for the trial period that begins 9/28/2020 @ 09:00 AM in U.S. Courthouse Pensacola. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 9/24/2019. (MB)
September 23, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #6 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (MB)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (MOODY, THOMAS)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (MOODY, THOMAS)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 9/11/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/11/2019. Discovery due by 12/26/2019. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 8/28/2019. (MB)
August 27, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal (please see proposed ISO). (MB)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (MB)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty US, Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty, Inc. for LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY.. (MOODY, THOMAS)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY from Fourteenth Judicial Circuit in and For Bay County, Florida, case number 19-002845CA. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4602266.), filed by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (MOODY, THOMAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Tyson et al v. LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanne O'Tyson
Represented By: AMY D BOGGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack O'Tyson
Represented By: AMY D BOGGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: THOMAS JAMES MOODY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?