TEMPERLEY ET AL v. LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: Jeff and Stacey Temperley, STACEY TEMPERLEY and JEFF TEMPERLEY
Defendant: LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 5:2019cv00315
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (DORNSTEIN, SCOTT)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Plaintiff shall have until September 16, 2019, to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 9/9/2019. (Answer due by 9/16/2019.) (MB)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint) (DORNSTEIN, SCOTT)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT for JEFFREY D GROOVER. (MB)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE for JEFFREY D GROOVER. (MB)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (MB)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc., Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc.,, Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty, Inc. for LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY.. (DORNSTEIN, SCOTT)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY from In the Fourteenth Circuit Court in and for Bay County, Florida, case number 2019-CA-002635. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4605987.), filed by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet 6) (DORNSTEIN, SCOTT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TEMPERLEY ET AL v. LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff and Stacey Temperley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STACEY TEMPERLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFF TEMPERLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: SCOTT JEFFREY DORNSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?