VAZQUEZ v. CITY OF MEXICO BEACH
Plaintiff: HECTOR VAZQUEZ
Defendant: CITY OF MEXICO BEACH
Case Number: 5:2019cv00317
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER PLACING CASE IN ABEYANCE re #11 Notice of Settlement. This case is placed in abeyance while the parties' finalize their settlement, and the parties shall file a status report 60 days after the date of this Order and every 60 days thereafter until the case is dismissed. (Status Report due by 12/18/2019.) Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 10/18/2019. (MB)
October 17, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #11 NOTICE of Settlement & Consent Motion to Hold Case in Abeyance. (sdw)
October 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Settlement & Consent Motion to Hold Case in Abeyance by CITY OF MEXICO BEACH (GRAHAM, WILLIAM)
October 15, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (sdw)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Joint MOTION to Extend Time of Deadlins Established by Initial Scheduling Order. The deadlines in the Initial Scheduling Order are stayed pending completion of mediation in the related Case No. 5:19cv15-TKW- MJF. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 10/7/2019. (sdw)
October 7, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #9 Joint MOTION to Extend Time of Deadlins Established by Initial Scheduling Order. (sdw)
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Extend Time of Deadlins Established by Initial Scheduling Order by CITY OF MEXICO BEACH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (GRAHAM, WILLIAM)
September 28, 2019 Set Deadlines re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 10/14/2019.) (sdw)
September 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by HECTOR VAZQUEZ. (RUMPH, JERRY)
September 16, 2019 Set Deadlines re #7 Order. Answer due by 10/7/2019. (sdw)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . The deadline for Defendant to respond to the complaint is extended to 14 days after the conclusion of mediation in the related case number 5:19cv15-TKW-MJF. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 9/16/2019. (sdw)
September 13, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #6 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . (sdw)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CITY OF MEXICO BEACH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (GRAHAM, WILLIAM)
September 13, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. (sdw)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by CITY OF MEXICO BEACH. (GRAHAM, WILLIAM) Modified on 9/13/2019 to terminate motion (sdw).
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 9/17/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/17/2019. Discovery due by 12/30/2019. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 9/3/2019. (sdw)
August 30, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal. (please see proposed ISO) (sdw)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to Adverse Parties by CITY OF MEXICO BEACH (GRAHAM, WILLIAM)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (GRAHAM, WILLIAM)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CITY OF MEXICO BEACH from Circuit, Bay County, case number 19002978CA. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4606666.), filed by CITY OF MEXICO BEACH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Notice of Removal) (GRAHAM, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VAZQUEZ v. CITY OF MEXICO BEACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF MEXICO BEACH
Represented By: WILLIAM B GRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HECTOR VAZQUEZ
Represented By: CHRISTINE DANIELLE SMALLWOOD MIRANDA
Represented By: MICHAEL JONATHAN HENRY
Represented By: JERRY LEWIS RUMPH, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?