HBL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC v. INDEPENDENT SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: HBL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC
Defendant: INDEPENDENT SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 5:2019cv00338
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER re #10 Joint Report. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 6/10/2020. Discovery due by 5/11/2020. Mediation to take place by 7/10/2020. Mediation Report due by 7/24/2020. Jury Trial set for 1/19/2021. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 9/26/2019. (sdw)
September 25, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #10 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (sdw)
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (DIDIER, TERRIE)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT by INDEPENDENT SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (BIBB, DAVID)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT against INDEPENDENT SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, filed by HBL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Composite Exhibit A) (DIDIER, TERRIE)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING OF EXHIBITS TO INDEX OF RECORD (DOC. 1-6) by INDEPENDENT SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K) (BIBB, DAVID)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by HBL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC. (DIDIER, TERRIE)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 9/27/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/28/2019. Discovery due by 1/10/2020. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 9/13/2019. (sdw)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS FREDERIC GONZALEZ on behalf of HBL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC (GONZALEZ, THOMAS)
September 12, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal. (please see proposed ISO) (sdw)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by TERRIE DIDIER on behalf of HBL Property Management LLC (DIDIER, TERRIE)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Independent Specialty Insurance Company. (BIBB, DAVID) Modified on 9/12/2019 to edit title of document (sdw).
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Independent Specialty Insurance Company from Bay County Court, case number 19002831CA. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4618714.), filed by Independent Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Index of Record, #7 Notice of Appearance) (BIBB, DAVID)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HBL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC v. INDEPENDENT SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HBL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC
Represented By: THOMAS FREDERIC GONZALEZ
Represented By: TERRIE DIDIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDEPENDENT SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: BRIAN PATRICK HENRY
Represented By: DAVID CRAWFORD BIBB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?