SHOWALTER CONSTRUCTION & RESTORATION LLC v. SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: SHOWALTER CONSTRUCTION & RESTORATION LLC
Defendant: SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 5:2019cv00348
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW LEE SMITH on behalf of SHOWALTER CONSTRUCTION & RESTORATION LLC (SMITH, ANDREW)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 10/30/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/29/2019. Discovery due by 2/12/2020. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 10/16/2019. (sdw)
October 15, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal. (please see proposed ISO) (sdw)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, Corporate Parent Showalter Construction & Restoration, LLC a/a/o Cartaya Commercial Company, LLC, Corporate Parent Cartaya Commercial Company, LLC for SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY.. (KREISER, ERIN)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTIONS by SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY (KREISER, ERIN)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE. (Attachments: #1 NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT)(mailed to Pla's counsel via USPS) (sdw)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY from Bay County, case number 2019-CA-000820. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4626413.), filed by SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Copies of All Process, #3 Supplement Notice of Removal to Opposing Counsel, #4 Supplement Notice of Removal to State Court) (ROCK, ANDREW) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/19/2019) (sdw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHOWALTER CONSTRUCTION & RESTORATION LLC v. SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHOWALTER CONSTRUCTION & RESTORATION LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: ANDREW P ROCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?