JOHNSON v. ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: Pauline Johnson
Defendant: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 5:2019cv00432
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:4001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/16/2020. Discovery due by 3/31/2020. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 12/3/2019. (jcw)
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (SULLIVAN, SEAN)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (SULLIVAN, SEAN)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Sean P. Sullivan is admitted pro hac vice to represent the Defendant pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(c). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 11/26/2019. (jcw)
November 26, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sean P. Sullivan.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4717249.) by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (SULLIVAN, SEAN)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (jcw)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jcw)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4682686.), filed by Pauline Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (BEARMAN, SAMUEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOHNSON v. ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: ILIAURA HANDS
Represented By: SEAN P SULLIVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pauline Johnson
Represented By: SAMUEL W BEARMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?