MATTHEWS et al v. NATIONAL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: Ralph & Elizabeth Matthews, RALPH MATTHEWS and ELIZABETH MATTHEWS
Defendant: NATIONAL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 5:2019cv00438
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER Re: #9 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting : Discovery due by 6/12/2020., Dispositive Motions to be filed by 7/3/2020., Jury Trial set for 8/17/2020 08:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE., Mediation Report due by 7/10/2020., Case referred to mediation. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 12/30/2019. (jcw)
December 10, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (BIBB, DAVID)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/2/2020. Discovery due by 3/11/2020. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 11/18/2019. (jcw)
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by NATIONAL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent NATIONAL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY for NATIONAL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.. (BIBB, DAVID)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number FLN400037925. Fee status updated to paid. (blb)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED DOCUMENT by NATIONAL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, Index of Record. (BIBB, DAVID)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BIBB, DAVID)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: In accordance with N.D. Fla. Loc. R. 5.2, a completed Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44) is to be filed with each civil case. Therefore, please file the civil cover sheet using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet", which is found under "Other Documents". (jcw)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: A reminder that party names (including aliases) are to be added using all caps and no punctuation. (See "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing", available on Clerk's website.) The party names will be corrected by the clerk. (jcw)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NATIONAL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY UNDER DIVERSITY OF CITIZENSHIP JURISDICTION 28 USCS 1441 from Gulf County Circuit Court, case number 2019-CA-81., filed by NATIONAL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (BIBB, DAVID)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MATTHEWS et al v. NATIONAL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph & Elizabeth Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RALPH MATTHEWS
Represented By: ANDREW PHILIP MCDONALD
Represented By: DAVID DUFF BARNHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH MATTHEWS
Represented By: ANDREW PHILIP MCDONALD
Represented By: DAVID DUFF BARNHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: DAVID CRAWFORD BIBB
Represented By: BRIAN PATRICK HENRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?