PINEY GROVE MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH INC v. CHURCH MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: Piney Grove Missionary Baptist Church, Inc. and PINEY GROVE MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH INC
Defendant: Church Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00451
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER re #11 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting : ( Discovery due by 7/31/2020., Dispositive Motions to be filed by 8/14/2020., Jury Trial set for 11/16/2020 08:15 AM EST in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE., Mediation Report due by 8/28/2020.), Case referred to mediation. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 12/23/2019. (jcw)
December 6, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (HATCH, GEORGE)
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by CHURCH MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (HATCH, GEORGE)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER - Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 11/27/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/27/2019. Discovery due by 3/6/2020. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 11/13/2019. (jcw)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by CHURCH MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (HATCH, GEORGE)
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE as to JOHN A. SALCEDO re PINEY GROVE MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH INC. (jcw)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT TO ALL COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that for all future pleadings, for this case and any future cases assigned to Judge Hinkle, any exhibit attached to a document filing should be properly identified. (Example: Deposition of John Doe rather than Exhibit A.) (jcw)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED DOCUMENT by CHURCH MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Filing State Court Documents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H) (HATCH, GEORGE)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (HATCH, GEORGE)
November 7, 2019 Set/Reset Deadline - Clerk to check status of attorney admission for PETER MINEO, JR. on 12/9/2019. (jcw)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE as to PETER MINEO, JR. re PINEY GROVE MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH INC. (jcw)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by CHURCH MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. Counsel is reminded that party names are to be added using all caps and no punctuation. (See "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing", available on Clerk's website.) The party names will be corrected by the clerk. In addition, a completed Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44) is to be filed with each civil case. Therefore, please file the civil cover sheet using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet", which is found under "Other Documents". See N.D. Fla. Loc. R. 5.2. (jcw)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Church Mutual Insurance Company from 14th Judicial Circuit in and for Jackson County, case number 19-540-CA. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4691183.), filed by Church Mutual Insurance Company. (HATCH, GEORGE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PINEY GROVE MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH INC v. CHURCH MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Piney Grove Missionary Baptist Church, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PINEY GROVE MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH INC
Represented By: GARRETT SCOTT ELSINGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Church Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: GEORGE WILLIAM HATCH, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?