LAGRONE-BEY v. DAVIS et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL A LAGRONE-BEY
Defendant: SHARON KRATTS, KIM DAVIS, TOMMY FORD and CHRISTOPHER REXFORD
Case Number: 5:2019cv00493
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On or before 2/11/2020, Plaintiff shall explain why this case should not be dismissed for: (a) failure to comply with a court order; (b) failure to pay the filing fee; and (c) failure to prosecute. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 1/21/2020. (jcw)
January 3, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #3 Order - Filing fee has not been paid. (jcw)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #1 Complaint. The clerk of the court shall send Plaintiff a motion to proceed in forma pauperis for use by non-prisoners. This case number should be written on the forms. On or before 1/2/2020, Plaintiff shall either: a. pay $400.00 (a $350.00 filing fee and a $50.00 administrative fee); submit a fully completed motion to proceed in forma pauperis for use by non-prisoners. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 12/11/2019. (jcw)(Form mailed as ordered.)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se (jcw)
November 26, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. (jcw)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KIM DAVIS, TOMMY FORD, SHARON KRATTS, CHRISTOPHER REXFORD, filed by MICHAEL A LAGRONE-BEY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (Filing fee was not paid. No service copies filed.)(jcw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LAGRONE-BEY v. DAVIS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHARON KRATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIM DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOMMY FORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER REXFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL A LAGRONE-BEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?