TASKER v. NORTHWEST FLORIDA RECEPTION CENTER et al
Plaintiff: RICHARD ALFRED TASKER
Defendant: NORTHWEST FLORIDA RECEPTION CENTER and FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Case Number: 5:2019cv00545
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re #9 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation. 90 Day No Activity Deadline set for 4/13/2020. (sdw)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ADOPTING #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. This case is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b)(1) and 1915(e)(2)(B)(i). The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 1/13/2020. (sdw)
January 9, 2020 Filing 8 OBJECTION to #5 Report and Recommendations by RICHARD ALFRED TASKER. (MB)
January 9, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #8 Objection to #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION (MB)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections. That Plaintiff shall have 14 days from the date of this Order to file objections to the magistrate judge's Report and Recommendation. No further extensions will be granted. (Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 1/13/2020.) Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 12/30/2019. (MB)
December 27, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections as to #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by RICHARD ALFRED TASKER. (jcw)
December 27, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections as to #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (jcw)
December 9, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint. For the reasons set forth above, the undersigned respectfully RECOMMENDS that: This case be DISMISSED without prejudice, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b)(1) and 1915(e)(2)(B)(i), for maliciousness and abuse of the judicial process. The clerk of the court be directed to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. (Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 1/6/2020.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 12/9/2019. (jcw)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REFERRAL AND ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 12/9/2019. (jcw)Fee status updated to in forma pauperis
December 3, 2019 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se (jcw)
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RICHARD ALFRED TASKER. (jcw)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, NORTHWEST FLORIDA RECEPTION CENTER, filed by RICHARD ALFRED TASKER. (Filing fee was not paid. 1 service copy filed.) (jcw)
December 3, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Complaint. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TASKER v. NORTHWEST FLORIDA RECEPTION CENTER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHWEST FLORIDA RECEPTION CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD ALFRED TASKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?