MELVIN v. WALMART et al
Plaintiff: CHARITO MELVIN
Defendant: DAVID HENRY, WALMART and BRANDON SIMON
Case Number: 5:2020cv00051
Filed: February 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
2 Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number FLN3-13646. Fee status updated to paid. (jcw)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION TO COMPLY WITH ORDER OF 2/25/2020 re #8 Order (construed as Notice to the Court) by CHARITO MELVIN. (jcw) Modified on 2/26/2020 (jcw).
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: 10 Filing Fee Received, #9 MOTION TO COMPLY WITH ORDER OF 2/25/2020 re #8 Order. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #6 Motion to Amend; denying #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. On or before 3/25/2020, Plaintiff shall pay the $400.00 filing fee. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 2/25/2020. (jcw)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CHARITO MELVIN. (jcw)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION TO AMEND OR REPLACE AFFIDAVIT OF FINANCIAL STATUS by CHARITO MELVIN. (jcw)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #6 MOTION TO AMEND OR REPLACE AFFIDAVIT OF FINANCIAL STATUS, #7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. On or before 3/18/2020, Plaintiff shall pay the $400.00 filing fee. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 2/18/2020. (jcw)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION. Case reassigned to CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER for all further proceedings. JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR no longer assigned to case signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 2/11/20. Please add the new judge initials to the case number for all future filings - 5:20cv51 MW/MJF. (bkp)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se (jcw)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CHARITO MELVIN. (jcw)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DAVID HENRY, BRANDON SIMON, WALMART, filed by CHARITO MELVIN. (Filing fee was not paid. No service copies filed.) (jcw)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MELVIN v. WALMART et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARITO MELVIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID HENRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALMART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRANDON SIMON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?