IN THE MATTER OF INLAND CONSTRUCTION AND ENGINEERING INC AS OWNER OF THE 1960 43' TUG VESSEL 'MISS HALEY'
Petitioner: IN THE MATTER OF INLAND CONSTRUCTION AND ENGINEERING INC AS OWNER OF THE 1960 43' TUG VESSEL 'MISS HALEY'
Claimant: CORY CALLIHAN
Case Number: 5:2020cv00071
Filed: February 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Filing 10 DISCOVERY ADVISORY: Re #9 REQUEST FOR INTERROGATORIES, REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION, AND REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS filed by CORY CALLIHAN --- Counsels attention is directed to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5(d), which prohibits the filing of discovery materials (including notices of deposition, deposition transcripts, interrogatories and interrogatory responses and notices thereof, production requests and responses and notices thereof, and admissions requests and responses and notices thereof) and disclosures under Rules 26(a)(1) and 26(a)(2), unless and until needed for consideration of pending motions by the court. This advisory serves as notice that no further discovery materials should be filed and all discovery posting options have been removed from CMECF. (kdm)
April 20, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR INTERROGATORIES, REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION, AND REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PETITIONER INLAND CONSTRUCTION AND ENGINEERING, INC. by CORY CALLIHAN. (BRUNER, DREW)
April 20, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISSOLVE THE LIMITATION INJUNCTION by CORY CALLIHAN. (BRUNER, DREW)
April 20, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION with regard to Limitation of Liability by CORY CALLIHAN. (BRUNER, DREW)
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #1 Admirality Claim,, by CORY CALLIHAN. (BRUNER, DREW)
April 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by DREW GORDY BRUNER on behalf of Claimant (BRUNER, DREW) Modified on 4/15/2020 (tss).
April 1, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO CLAIMANTS OF COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 4/1/20. Claims must be filed by 5/4/2020. (tss)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER APPROVING AD INTERIM STIPULATION OF VALUE, DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF MONITION AND INJUNCTION re #1 ADMIRALITY CLAIM. Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 3/27/2020. (kdm)
February 28, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (PENNEKAMP, JOHN)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1 ADMIRALITY CLAIM against IN THE MATTER OF INLAND CONSTRUCTION AND ENGINEERING INC AS OWNER OF THE 1960 43' TUG VESSEL 'MISS HALEY' ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4912462.), filed by IN THE MATTER OF INLAND CONSTRUCTION AND ENGINEERING INC AS OWNER OF THE 1960 43' TUG VESSEL 'MISS HALEY'. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Value, #3 Exhibit C - Ad Interim Stipulation, #4 Exhibit D - Proposed Order, #5 Exhibit E - Notice to Claimants) (PENNEKAMP, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN THE MATTER OF INLAND CONSTRUCTION AND ENGINEERING INC AS OWNER OF THE 1960 43' TUG VESSEL 'MISS HALEY'
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: IN THE MATTER OF INLAND CONSTRUCTION AND ENGINEERING INC AS OWNER OF THE 1960 43' TUG VESSEL 'MISS HALEY'
Represented By: JOHN MICHAEL PENNEKAMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: CORY CALLIHAN
Represented By: DREW GORDY BRUNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?