ARNOLD v. BELFOR USA GROUP INC
Plaintiff: Barrie Arnold
Defendant: BELFOR USA GROUP INC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00146
Filed: May 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 7/9/20. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/10/2020. Discovery due by 1/4/2021. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 1/25/2021. Jury Trial set for 5/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR. (tss)
July 8, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by BELFOR USA GROUP INC. (SOKOLOW, DENA)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 6/25/20. Answer due by 7/8/2020. (tss)
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint by BELFOR USA GROUP INC. (SOKOLOW, DENA)
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Corporate Counsel for Defendant on 6/3/2020, filed by BARRIE ARNOLD. (MACNAMARA, MATTHEW)
May 20, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BELFOR USA GROUP INC. (tss)
May 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (MACNAMARA, MATTHEW)
May 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BELFOR USA GROUP INC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5232737.), filed by Barrie Arnold. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Defendant) (MACNAMARA, MATTHEW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ARNOLD v. BELFOR USA GROUP INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barrie Arnold
Represented By: MATTHEW DAVID MACNAMARA
Represented By: ROBERT MARION SCOTT
Represented By: JOHN CLINT WALLACE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BELFOR USA GROUP INC
Represented By: RUSSELL BRADBURY BUCHANAN
Represented By: DENA HOLLY SOKOLOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?