WOODELL v. BARRETT
Plaintiff: KATHRYN WOODELL
Defendant: BARBARA SECRETARY US AIR FORCE BARRETT
Case Number: 5:2020cv00182
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 29:0794
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KATHRYN WOODELL. BARBARA SECRETARY US AIR FORCE BARRETT served on 7/8/2020, answer due 7/29/2020. (MATTOX, MARIE)
July 6, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BARBARA SECRETARY US AIR FORCE BARRETT. (Attachments: #1 Summons Keef, #2 Summons Barr) (alb)
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (MATTOX, MARIE)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BARBARA SECRETARY US AIR FORCE BARRETT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5438295.), filed by KATHRYN WOODELL. (Attachments: #1 Summons to be issued by clerk, #2 Summons to be issued by Clerk, #3 summons to be issued by Clerk) (MATTOX, MARIE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WOODELL v. BARRETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARBARA SECRETARY US AIR FORCE BARRETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHRYN WOODELL
Represented By: MARIE A MATTOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?