SKEETE v. STURGEON AQUAFARMS II LLC
Plaintiff: VERNE SKEETE, JR
Defendant: STURGEON AQUAFARMS II LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00217
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT. Defendant may file a response to the Plaintiff's Amended Complaint on or before October 30, 2020. ( Answer due by 10/30/2020.) Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 10/9/2020. (alb)
October 8, 2020 Filing 19 DEFENDANTS CONSENTED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT re #16 Amended Complaint by STURGEON AQUAFARMS II LLC. (HANNAH, RODERICK) Modified on 10/8/2020 to correct title (jcw).
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT re #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 9/28/2020. (jcw)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER Re: #15 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting :( Discovery due by 4/26/2021., Dispositive Motions to be filed by 5/17/2021., Jury Trial set for 9/20/2021 08:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER., Mediation Report due by 6/8/2021.), Case referred to mediation. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 9/28/2020. (jcw)
September 25, 2020 Filing 16 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against STURGEON AQUAFARMS II LLC, filed by VERNE SKEETE, JR. (MATTOX, MARIE)
September 25, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re: #15 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (jcw)
September 24, 2020 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (MATTOX, MARIE)
September 21, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re: #4 Initial Scheduling Order - Status report has not been filed. (jcw)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION TO RESPOND OR AMEND re #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS. Plaintiff may file a response or amend his complaint on or before 9/25/2020. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 9/21/2020. (jcw)
September 18, 2020 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by VERNE SKEETE, JR. (MATTOX, MARIE)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL re #11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Defendant continues to be represented by counsel, and representation will continue uninterrupted. This motion is, therefore, GRANTED. The Clerk shall disconnect Peter T. Mavrick from CM/ECF on this matter. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 9/15/2020. (jcw)
September 14, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL AND MOTION TO WITHDRAW by STURGEON AQUAFARMS II LLC. (MAVRICK, PETER) Modified on 9/15/2020 to correct title (jcw).
September 11, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by RODERICK VICTOR HANNAH on behalf of All Defendants (HANNAH, RODERICK)
September 8, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 9/18/2020). (jcw)
September 4, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by STURGEON AQUAFARMS II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit Determination: Reasonable Cause, #3 Exhibit Notice of Withdrawal, #4 Exhibit Order Closing File and Relinquishing Jurisdiction, #5 Exhibit Notice of Dismissal) (MAVRICK, PETER)
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by STURGEON AQUAFARMS II LLC. (MAVRICK, PETER)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME re #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall respond on or before September 4, 2020. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 8/24/2020. (jcw)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by STURGEON AQUAFARMS II LLC. (MAVRICK, PETER)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (MAVRICK, PETER)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER - Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 9/2/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/2/2020. Discovery due by 12/17/2020. Status Report due by 9/18/2020. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 8/19/2020. (jcw)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE as to Elizabeth Olivia Hueber, Esq. re STURGEON AQUAFARMS II LLC. (jcw)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: In accordance with N.D. Fla. Loc. R. 5.2, a completed Civil Cover Sheet is to be filed with each civil case. Therefore, please file the civil cover sheet using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet", which is found under "Other Documents". (jcw)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sturgeon Aquafarms II, LLC from 14th Judicial Circuit Court, Jackson County, Florida, case number 20-CA-000166. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5593876.), filed by Sturgeon Aquafarms II, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Summons and Complaint) (MAVRICK, PETER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SKEETE v. STURGEON AQUAFARMS II LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STURGEON AQUAFARMS II LLC
Represented By: PETER THEODORE MAVRICK
Represented By: RODERICK VICTOR HANNAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VERNE SKEETE, JR
Represented By: MARIE A MATTOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?