HILL v. HEWETT TIRE & AUTO CENTER, INC. et al
Plaintiff: VICTOR HILL
Defendant: SANDRA HEWETT, BILLY E HEWETT, HOME TOWN TOWING #1, INC., HEWETT TIRE & AUTO CENTER, INC. and BILLY E. HEWETT JR.
Case Number: 5:2020cv00218
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by BILLY E HEWETT, SANDRA HEWETT, BILLY E. HEWETT JR., HEWETT TIRE & AUTO CENTER, INC., HOME TOWN TOWING #1, INC.. (BLANCHFIELD, ROBERT)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER re #13 Joint REPORT. Discovery due by 4/23/2021. The deadline for filing potentially dispositive Motions, as well as daubert motions to be filed by 5/14/2021. Mediation to take place by 5/7/2021. Mediation Report due by 5/14/2021. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 10/14/2020. (mb)
October 14, 2020 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (NASO, RYAN)
October 7, 2020 Filing 12 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Each non-governmental corporate party must file a statement that identifies any parent corporation and any publicly held corporation that owns 10% or more of its stock or states that there is no such corporation. The deadline for filing the statement is set forth in Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, and, if not filed sooner, the statement must in any event be filed within 14 days of the date of the scheduling order. The deadline expired on 10/7/2020. A corporate disclosure statement must be filed no later than 10/14/2020. Clerk to notify chambers on 10/14/2020. (mb)
September 29, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Sandra Hewett on September 22, 2020, filed by VICTOR HILL. (NASO, RYAN)
September 29, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Billy E. Hewett Jr. on September 22, 2020, filed by VICTOR HILL. (NASO, RYAN)
September 29, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Billy E. Hewitt on September 22, 2020, filed by VICTOR HILL. (NASO, RYAN)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 10/7/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/6/2020. Discovery due by 1/20/2021. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 9/23/2020. (mb)
September 22, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by BILLY E HEWETT, SANDRA HEWETT, BILLY E. HEWETT JR., HEWETT TIRE & AUTO CENTER, INC., HOME TOWN TOWING #1, INC.. (BLANCHFIELD, ROBERT)
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to SANDRA HEWETT. (mb)
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Summons for Sandra Hewett by VICTOR HILL (SCHMITZ, GREGORY)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (SCHMITZ, GREGORY)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN DOMINICK NASO on behalf of All Plaintiffs (NASO, RYAN)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to BILLY E HEWETT, SANDRA HEWETT, BILLY E HEWETT JR, HEWETT TIRE & AUTO CENTER INC, and HOME TOWN TOWING #1 INC. (sdw)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5594639.), filed by VICTOR HILL. (Attachments: #1 SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR ALL DEFENDANTS) (SCHMITZ, GREGORY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HILL v. HEWETT TIRE & AUTO CENTER, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDRA HEWETT
Represented By: ROBERT BLANCHFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BILLY E HEWETT
Represented By: ROBERT BLANCHFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOME TOWN TOWING #1, INC.
Represented By: ROBERT BLANCHFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEWETT TIRE & AUTO CENTER, INC.
Represented By: ROBERT BLANCHFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BILLY E. HEWETT JR.
Represented By: ROBERT BLANCHFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICTOR HILL
Represented By: GREGORY RONALD SCHMITZ
Represented By: RYAN DOMINICK NASO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?