MOORE v. CATALYST FABRIC SOLUTIONS, LLC
Plaintiff: CHRIST MOORE
Defendant: CATALYST FABRIC SOLUTIONS, LLC and CATALYST FABRIC SOLUTIONS LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00331
Filed: December 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2021 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (KELLY, MICHAEL)
February 1, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CHRIST MOORE. (JACKSON, MARY)
January 28, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by CATALYST FABRIC SOLUTIONS LLC. (KELLY, MICHAEL)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 1/26/21. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 2/9/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/20/2021. Discovery due by 6/30/2021. Trial set for 11/8/2021 at 08:30 AM EST in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR. (tss)
January 19, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by CATALYST FABRIC SOLUTIONS LLC. (KELLY, MICHAEL)
January 7, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHRIST MOORE - CATALYST FABRIC SOLUTIONS LLC served on 12/29/2020, answer due 1/19/2021. (tss)
January 7, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Catalyst Fabric Solutions via Debbie Amos as Authorized Employee on 12/29/2020, filed by CHRIST MOORE. (JACKSON, MARY)
December 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CATALYST FABRIC SOLUTIONS LLC. (kdm)
December 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (kdm)
December 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CATALYST FABRIC SOLUTIONS, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-5839068.), filed by CHRIST MOORE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Proposed Summons) (JACKSON, MARY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOORE v. CATALYST FABRIC SOLUTIONS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATALYST FABRIC SOLUTIONS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATALYST FABRIC SOLUTIONS LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL BRIAN KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRIST MOORE
Represented By: MARY BUBBETT JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?