SUBJEK v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: STEVEN ALAN SUBJEK
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, ANDREW M SAUL, United States Attorney and Attorney General
Case Number: 5:2021cv00106
Filed: May 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2021 Set Deadlines re: #8 Attorney General Answer due by 8/16/2021. (blr)
July 11, 2021 Set Deadlines re: #9 ANDREW M SAUL Answer due by 8/16/2021. (blr)
June 28, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by STEVEN ALAN SUBJEK. ANDREW M SAUL served on 6/17/2021, answer due 7/8/2021. (MOHNEY, DOUGLAS)
June 24, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by STEVEN ALAN SUBJEK. Attorney General served on 6/21/2021, answer due 7/12/2021. (MOHNEY, DOUGLAS)
June 23, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by STEVEN ALAN SUBJEK. United States Attorney served on 6/16/2021, answer due 7/7/2021. (MOHNEY, DOUGLAS)
June 11, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to ANDREW M SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (alb)
May 26, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS by STEVEN ALAN SUBJEK. (MOHNEY, DOUGLAS)
May 26, 2021 Filing 4 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re #3 Notice of Summonses. The summonses you supplied, have not been properly completed. You may obtain the two page summons form by visiting our website at http://www.flnd.uscourts.gov. Click on Forms & Publications; national court forms; AO 440 Summons in a Civil Action. The Clerk will issue summons upon resubmission. In addition, when posting the Summonses, you should post a REQUEST FOR SUMMONS, by selecting "Request/Demand" found under "Other Documents" under "Other Filings", then attach each proposed summons to the Request. (blr)
May 26, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. (no service copies) (blr)
May 25, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Summonses by STEVEN ALAN SUBJEK re #1 Complaint, 2 Docket Annotation, (MOHNEY, DOUGLAS)
May 18, 2021 Filing 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The clerk will issue summons upon submission. You may obtain the two page summons form by visiting our website at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. Click on Forms & Publications; national court forms; AO 440 Summons in a Civil Action (revised 6/12). (blr)
May 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6095264.), filed by STEVEN ALAN SUBJEK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (MOHNEY, DOUGLAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SUBJEK v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN ALAN SUBJEK
Represented By: DOUGLAS DALE MOHNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?