PIGNERI AND LYON INC v. WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: Pigneri and Lyon, Inc. d/b/a Uncle Ernie's Restaurant and PIGNERI AND LYON INC doing business as UNCLE ERNIES RESTAURANT
Defendant: WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY and CHUBB INSURANCE SOLUTIONS AGENCY INC
Case Number: 5:2021cv00176
Filed: September 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL. The #8 motion is GRANTED, and the claims against Defendant Chubb Insurance Solutions Agency, Inc. (Chubb) are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk shall terminate Chubb as a defendant in CM/ECF. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 10/8/2021. CHUBB INSURANCE SOLUTIONS AGENCY INC terminated. (alb)
October 7, 2021 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Chubb Insurance Solutions Agency, Inc. by WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY. (DICKENSON, JOHN)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER re #6 Joint REPORT. Fact Discovery due by 7/21/2022. Expert Discovery due by 9/8/2022. The deadline to file potentially Dispositive Motions as well as daubert motions to be filed by 7/28/2022. Mediation to take place by 9/29/2022. Mediation Report due by 10/6/2022. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 10/7/2021. (mb)
October 6, 2021 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (DICKENSON, JOHN)
September 15, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by PIGNERI AND LYON INC. (LITTMAN, GREGORY)
September 10, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY. (DICKENSON, JOHN) Modified on 9/10/2021 to note duplicate. (mb).
September 10, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY. (DICKENSON, JOHN)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 9/22/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/22/2021. Discovery due by 3/2/2022. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 9/8/2021. (mb)
September 7, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal. (Please see proposed ISO.) (alb)
September 3, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY from Bay County Circuit Court, case number 21-000958-CA. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number CFLNDC-6286434.), filed by WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (DICKENSON, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PIGNERI AND LYON INC v. WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pigneri and Lyon, Inc. d/b/a Uncle Ernie's Restaurant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PIGNERI AND LYON INC doing business as UNCLE ERNIES RESTAURANT
Represented By: GREGORY C LITTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JOHN DAVID DICKENSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHUBB INSURANCE SOLUTIONS AGENCY INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?