PAL ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES CORPORATION v. TRANS4FED LLC
Plaintiff: PAL ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES CORPORATION
Defendant: TRANS4FED, LLC and TRANS4FED LLC
Case Number: 5:2021cv00184
Filed: September 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 11, 2021 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (BENFORD, JOHN)
November 5, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint, by TRANS4FED LLC. (SLOAN, TIMOTHY)
October 27, 2021 Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against TRANS4FED LLC, filed by PAL ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1-Building 1550 Agreement, #2 Exhibit Ex 2-Building 164 Agreement, #3 Exhibit Ex 3-Applications for Payment, #4 Exhibit Ex 4-Cash Receipt and Billing Report) (BENFORD, JOHN)
October 27, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by PAL ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES CORPORATION. (BENFORD, JOHN)
October 27, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Kim Grant, Paralegal for John D. Moore, Registered Agent on 9/20/2021, filed by PAL ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES CORPORATION. (BENFORD, JOHN)
October 27, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by TRANS4FED LLC. (SLOAN, TIMOTHY)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 10/13/21. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 10/27/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/12/2021. Discovery due by 2/4/2022. Trial set for 4/13/2022 at 08:30 AM EST in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR. (tss)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING JURISDICTION re #1 Complaint. (First Amended Complaint due by 10/27/2021). Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 10/13/2021. (kdm)
October 11, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by TRANS4FED LLC. (SLOAN, TIMOTHY)
September 14, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BENFORD, JOHN)
September 14, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to TRANS4FED LLC. (kdm)
September 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TRANS4FED, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6306945.), filed by PAL ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1-Building 1550 Agreement, #2 Exhibit Ex 2-Building 164 Agreement, #3 Exhibit Ex 3-Applications for Payment, #4 Exhibit Ex 4-Cash Receipt and Billing Report, #5 Supplement Proposed Summons for Issuance by Clerk) (BENFORD, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PAL ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES CORPORATION v. TRANS4FED LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAL ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES CORPORATION
Represented By: JOHN Y BENFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANS4FED, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANS4FED LLC
Represented By: TIMOTHY JAMES SLOAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?