VANN v. SAUL
Plaintiff: SHELIA RENE VANN
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, ANDREW M SAUL, Attorney General of the U.S. and United States Attorney's Office
Case Number: 5:2022cv00001
Filed: January 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SHELIA RENE VANN. United States Attorney's Office served on 2/11/2022, answer due 3/4/2022. (MOHNEY, DOUGLAS)
February 25, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SHELIA RENE VANN. Commissioner of Social Security served on 2/14/2022, answer due 3/7/2022. (MOHNEY, DOUGLAS)
February 25, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SHELIA RENE VANN. Attorney General of the U.S. served on 2/15/2022, answer due 3/8/2022. (MOHNEY, DOUGLAS)
February 4, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Reissued as to KILOLO KAJAKAZI, (Attachments: #1 Summons - ATTORNEY GENERAL, #2 Summons - UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE). (mb)
January 13, 2022 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against ANDREW M SAUL, filed by SHELIA RENE VANN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit amended summons) (MOHNEY, DOUGLAS)
January 5, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ANDREW M SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jcw)
January 4, 2022 Filing 3 request summons by SHELIA RENE VANN. (MOHNEY, DOUGLAS)
January 4, 2022 Filing 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The clerk will issue summons upon submission. You may obtain the 2 page summons form by visiting our website @ www.flnd.uscourts.gov. Click on Forms & Publications; national court forms; AO 440 Summons in a Civil Action (revised 6/12). (jcw)
January 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6607850.), filed by SHELIA RENE VANN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (MOHNEY, DOUGLAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VANN v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHELIA RENE VANN
Represented By: DOUGLAS DALE MOHNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the U.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorney's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?