BROWN v. BAY COUNTY POLICE DEPARTMENT
Plaintiff: MICHAEL BROWN
Defendant: BAY COUNTY POLICE DEPARTMENT
Case Number: 5:2023cv00258
Filed: September 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2023 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #3 Order - No response filed. (jcw)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #1 Complaint. The clerk of the court shall send to Plaintiff a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis for use by prisoners. On or before 11/13/2023, Plaintiff shall: a. pay the $402.00 fee; or b. submit a fully-completed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis with the requisite Prisoner Consent Form and Financial Certificate signed by a jail official and an attached printout of the transactions in Plaintiff's inmate trust account, or the institutional equivalent, during the six-month period of incarceration preceding the filing of this suit. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 10/12/2023. (jcw)(Form sent as ordered.)
September 25, 2023 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se. Mailed to: MICHAEL BROWN, I31866, OKALOOSA CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, 3189 COLONEL GREG MALLOY, CRESTVIEW, FL 32539. (kdm)
September 25, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BAY COUNTY POLICE DEPARTMENT, filed by MICHAEL BROWN. (No service copies received, no fee paid, no motion for IFP received.) (kdm)
September 25, 2023 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint (No service copies received, no fee paid, no motion for IFP received). (kdm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROWN v. BAY COUNTY POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAY COUNTY POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?