WESLEY v. PAYNE et al
Plaintiff: JAMES ALLEN WESLEY, JR
Defendant: S PAYNE and C WALKER
Case Number: 5:2024cv00086
Filed: May 3, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2024 Filing 7 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered pursuant to #6 Order. (jfj)
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. The magistrate judge's Report and Recommendation (Doc. #5 ) is adopted and incorporated by reference in this Order. This case is DISMISSED without prejudice for maliciousness and abuse of the judicial process under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and 1915A(b)(1). The Clerk will enter judgment in accordance with this Oder and close the case file. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 06/03/24. (jfj)
May 9, 2024 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint. For the reasons set forth above, the undersigned respectfully RECOMMENDS that: This action be DISMISSED without prejudice for maliciousness and abuse of the judicial process under 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b)(1) and 1915(e)(2)(B)(i). The clerk of the court enter judgment accordingly and close this case file. (Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 6/6/2024.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 5/9/2024. (jcw)
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Because Plaintiff has no funds accrued in his prison trust fund account, the court will not assess Plaintiff an initial partial filing fee as provided in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). The clerk of court is directed to MAIL a copy of this order, with the appropriate cover letter to: Florida Department of Corrections, 501 South Calhoun St., Tallahassee, FL 32399-2500, Attention: Agency Clerk. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 5/8/2024. (jcw)(cc: FDOC)
May 7, 2024 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se Litigant. (jfj)
May 7, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jfj)
May 3, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JAMES ALLEN WESLEY, JR. (jfj)
May 3, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by JAMES ALLEN WESLEY, JR. (No service copies received. IFP motion received.) (jfj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WESLEY v. PAYNE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES ALLEN WESLEY, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S PAYNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C WALKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?