The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania v. Lyons et al
Plaintiff: The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania
Defendant: Matthew Lyons, Dwight Grant, Karla Holmes, Julio Gabrin, Deanna Guynup, Alicia Dicks, Edrick Blackwood, Enterprise Leasing Company, Damian Robinson and Justin Rowinsky
Case Number: 0:2007cv61100
Filed: August 6, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Ft. Lauderdale Office
County: Broward
Presiding Judge: James I. Cohn
Presiding Judge: Lurana S. Snow
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER adopting 121 Report and Recommendations; Order denying 112 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 112 Motion for Taxation of Costs. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 2/11/2009. (lc1)
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 121 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to District Judge that Respondent Matthew Lyons' Motion to Tax Costs and Attorney Fees [DE 112] be DENIED. Please see Report and Recommendation for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 12/23/2008. (lc2)
December 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting 111 Dwight Grant's Motion for Taxation of Costs. Costs taxed in the amount of $ 664.95 against Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania; Order adopting Report and Recommendations re 118 Motion to Tax Costs. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 12/12/2008. (lc1)
November 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 118 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 111 Respondent Dwight Grant's MOTION to Tax Costs. Recommending granting. Objections to R&R due by 11/24/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 11/5/2008. (lc1)
September 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 110 JUDGMENT in favor of the Respondents against the Petitioner. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 9/26/08. (lc1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania v. Lyons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Joseph Kurt Kaple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight Grant
Represented By: Patricia Margaret Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karla Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julio Gabrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deanna Guynup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Dicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edrick Blackwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Leasing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damian Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Rowinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?