Mokris v. Mako Marine International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey G Mokris
Defendant: Mako Marine International, Inc., Tracker Marine Retail, LLC, TMBC, LLC, Bass Pro Group, LLC and American Sportsman Holdings Co.
Case Number: 0:2008cv61199
Filed: July 29, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Contract Product Liability Office
County: Broward
Presiding Judge: Kenneth A. Marra
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 221 OPINION AND ORDER denying 160 Motion to Certify Class; denying as moot 179 Motion for Leave to File supplement to reply in support of motion for class certification. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 10/6/2011. (ir)
May 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 193 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 151 Motion to Dismiss; denying 153 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 5/23/2011. (ir)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER AND OPINION denying in part and granting in part 48 Motion to Dismiss; granting 48 Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 11/17/2009. (ir)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mokris v. Mako Marine International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey G Mokris
Represented By: Robert Baldwin Brown, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mako Marine International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracker Marine Retail, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TMBC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bass Pro Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Sportsman Holdings Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?