DuChateau v. Camp, Dresser & McKee, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jeannine V. DuChateau
Defendant: Camp, Dresser & McKee, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2010cv60712
Filed: May 5, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Ft. Lauderdale Office
County: Broward
Presiding Judge: William J. Zloch
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 78 Defendant's Motion to Tax Costs. Please see Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 3/29/2012. (sry)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 40 Motion in Limine. Please see Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 12/19/2011. (RSR)
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 20 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Please see Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 10/4/2011. (sry)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DuChateau v. Camp, Dresser & McKee, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannine V. DuChateau
Represented By: G Ware Cornell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camp, Dresser & McKee, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Holland Loffredo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?