Estetique Inc. USA v. XPAMED, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Estetique Inc. USA
Defendant: Mario Guastella, Jose Montilla and XPAMED, LLC
Case Number: 0:2011cv61740
Filed: August 5, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Ft. Lauderdale Office
County: Broward
Presiding Judge: James I. Cohn
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 AMENDED ORDER -- correcting only title of 67 Order Denying Motion to Compel; denying Motion to Set Aside; granting in part and denying in part Motion to Increase Security Bond. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 11/22/2011. (prd)
September 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 30 Motion to Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order. See Order for details. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 9/14/2011. (prd)
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting renewed ore tenus Motion to Bring Electronic Devices to continued evidentiary hearing. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 9/8/2011. (prd)
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting 6 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; deferring ruling on 6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 8/5/2011. (prd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estetique Inc. USA v. XPAMED, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario Guastella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Montilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XPAMED, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estetique Inc. USA
Represented By: Daniel DeSouza
Represented By: Gary Charles Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?