BLANCO GmbH + Co. KG v. Vlanco Industries, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
BLANCO GmbH + Co. KG |
Defendant: |
Vlanco Industries, LLC, G-Tech-I, Inc. and Vito Antonio Laera |
Case Number: |
0:2012cv61580 |
Filed: |
August 14, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Florida |
Office: |
Ft. Lauderdale Office |
County: |
Broward |
Presiding Judge: |
Robin S. Rosenbaum |
Presiding Judge: |
Barry S. Seltzer |
Nature of Suit: |
Trademark |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. ยง 44 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 16, 2022 |
Filing
424
ORDER ADOPTING 422 Report and Recommendations on Plaintiff's Motion for Civil and Criminal Contempt Against Defendant Vito Antonio Laera, and GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 421 Plaintiff BLANCO GmbH + Co. KG's Motion for Civil and Criminal Contempt to Enforce this Court's Orders Against Vito Antonio Laera. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 2/16/2022. See attached document for full details. (gie)
|
July 30, 2015 |
Filing
398
OMNIBUS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re Defendant's Several "Notices" [ECF Nos. 303 ; 304 ; 307 ; 308 ; 315 ], and ORDER GRANTING 326 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike and DENYING WITHOUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff's 316 / 317 Motion/Request for Attorney's Fees and Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 7/30/2015. (tr00)
|
May 21, 2014 |
Filing
232
ORDER denying 211 Defendant Vito Antonio Laera's Motion for an Order to Void for Vagueness. Please see Order for details. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 5/21/2014. (ssk)
|
January 21, 2014 |
Filing
195
AMENDED ORDER Adopting Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation re 194 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend. Please see Order for details. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 1/21/2014. (ssk)
|
December 12, 2013 |
Filing
184
ORDER denying as moot 124 Defendant Laera's Motion to Suspend USPTO Proceedings; denying 130 Defendant Laera's Motion for Interpretation of Contract and Motion for Declaratory Judgment; denying 132 133 Defendant Laera's Request for Affirmative Relief; granting 149 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike 132 133 Defendant Laera's Counterclaim; denying 158 Defendant Laera's Motion to Compel; striking 159 Defendant Laera's Motion for Court Directive; grantin g 161 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike 159 Defendant Laera's Motion for Court Directive; denying 163 Defendant Laera's Motion for Request for Admission. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 12/12/2013. (tjs)
|
September 6, 2013 |
Filing
146
ORDER denying 144 Motion for Default Judgment. Please see Order for details. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 9/5/2013. (bon)
|
July 30, 2013 |
Filing
111
ORDER granting 110 Motion to Withdraw Motions. 89 Motion for Order to Show Cause and 101 Motion to Suspend USPTO Proceedings are terminated. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 7/30/2013. (bon)
|
July 25, 2013 |
Filing
108
ORDER denying 102 Motion to Set Aside Judgment. Please see Order for details. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 7/25/2013. (bon)
|
March 27, 2013 |
Filing
74
ORDER Requiring Stipulation of Dismissal. Please see Order for details. Stipulation of dismissal and any proposed judgment or injunction must be filed by 4/8/2013. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 3/27/2013. (bon)
|
December 12, 2012 |
Filing
48
ORDER denying 37 Vito Antonio Laera's Motion Requesting Appointment of Counsel; ORDER denying as moot 39 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike. Please see Order for details. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 12/12/2012. (bon)
|
December 7, 2012 |
Filing
44
ORDER denying 41 Motion of Diana Waterous Centorino, Esq., to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Please see Order for details. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 12/7/2012. (bon)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?