Taffe v. Wengert et al

Plaintiff: Donnett M Taffe
Defendant: Gerald E. Wengert and Scott J. Israel
Case Number: 0:2016cv61595
Filed: July 5, 2016
Court: Florida Southern District Court
Office: Ft Lauderdale Office
County: Broward (Office: Ft Lauderdale)
Presiding Judge: Marcia G. Cooke
Referring Judge: Edwin G. Torres
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1443
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 31, 2018 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENTdenying 102 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 1/31/2018. (tm)
August 10, 2017 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 110 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 8/10/2017. (js02)
August 8, 2017 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on 93 Plaintiff's Supplementation of the Record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 8/8/2017. (js02)
May 3, 2017 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 64 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 5/3/2017. (js02)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taffe v. Wengert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald E. Wengert
Represented By: Louis Reinstein
Represented By: Richard Thomas Woulfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott J. Israel
Represented By: Daniel Lee Losey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnett M Taffe
Represented By: Barbara A. Heyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?