ARcare, Inc. v. Trividia Healthcare Systems, LLC et al
Plaintiff: ARcare, Inc.
Defendant: Trividia Healthcare Systems, LLC and Trividia Health, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2017cv61382
Filed: July 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Ft Lauderdale Office
County: Broward (Office: Ft Lauderdale)
Presiding Judge: James I Cohn
Referring Judge: Barry S Seltzer
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER CLOSING CASE. Signed by Senior Judge James I. Cohn on 12/6/2017. (kpe) NOTICE: If there are sealed documents in this case, they may be unsealed after 1 year or as directed by Court Order, unless they have been designated to be permanently sealed. See Local Rule 5.4 and Administrative Order 2014-69.
December 6, 2017 Filing 22 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by ARcare, Inc. (Mussman, Louis)
September 1, 2017 Filing 21 Initial Disclosure(s) by Trividia Health, Inc., Trividia Healthcare Systems, LLC (Backman, Jeffrey)
August 7, 2017 Filing 20 NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Added David H. Lichter. (Mussman, Louis)
August 3, 2017 Filing 19 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by Trividia Health, Inc., Trividia Healthcare Systems, LLC. (Backman, Jeffrey)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REQUIRING MEDIATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 7/27/2017. (jas)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/1/2018. Expert Discovery due by 4/26/2018. Fact Discovery due by 4/12/2018. Joinder of Parties due by 2/1/2018. Mediation Deadline 6/14/2018. In Limine Motions due by 6/28/2018. Dispositive Pretrial Motions due by 5/10/2018. Joint Pretrial Stipulation due by 7/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 7/27/2017. (jas) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
July 27, 2017 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer: Scheduling Conference held on 7/27/2017. Counsel from both sides present in Court. Attorney Brian Tse-Hua Ku appeared telephonically. Scheduling Order to follow. (Digital 14:01:45-14:06:40) (at)
July 26, 2017 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Tse-Hua Ku on behalf of ARcare, Inc. (Ku, Brian)
July 26, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roy Taub on behalf of Trividia Health, Inc., Trividia Healthcare Systems, LLC. Attorney Roy Taub added to party Trividia Health, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Roy Taub added to party Trividia Healthcare Systems, LLC(pty:dft). (Taub, Roy)
July 26, 2017 Filing 13 Statement of: Certifying the Parties Have Conferred in Compliance with Court's Order by ARcare, Inc. re #8 Order, Set/Reset Hearings,, (Mussman, Louis)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Randall K. Pulliam. Please see Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 7/17/2017. (pb00)
July 17, 2017 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Randall K. Pulliam. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-9895956 by ARcare, Inc.. Responses due by 7/31/2017 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Randall K. Pulliam, Esq., #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mussman, Louis)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDERdenying #9 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference. Plaintiff's counsel in Seattle, Washington will attend by telephone; the Court will initiate the call. Defense counsel will send an associate attorney to be present at the Scheduling Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 7/17/2017. (pb00)
July 14, 2017 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Continue the Scheduling Conference re #8 Order, Set/Reset Hearings,, by ARcare, Inc.. Responses due by 7/28/2017 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mussman, Louis)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 7/27/2017 at 02:00 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division, Courtroom 205-C, before Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer. Please see Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 7/13/2017. (pb00)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING CALENDAR CALL AND TRIAL DATE, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE FOR SCHEDULING MATTERS AND PRETRIAL DISCOVERY MATTERS: (Jury Trial set for 7/16/2018 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Senior Judge James I. Cohn., Calendar Call set for 7/12/2018 09:00 AM before Senior Judge James I. Cohn.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer for Discovery Matters. Signed by Senior Judge James I. Cohn on 7/12/2017. (jas) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Defendants shall respond to the Amended Complaint [DE 1-2] on or before 8/3/2017. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 7/12/2017. (ksi)
July 12, 2017 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re #4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer . Document Not Linked; ERROR - The filed document was not linked to the related docket entry. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls)
July 12, 2017 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) by Trividia Health, Inc., Trividia Healthcare Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Backman, Jeffrey) Modified Link on 7/12/2017 (ls).
July 12, 2017 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Incorrect case opening information. The Filer selected the incorrect Cause of Action, Nature of Suit when filing. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (lrz1)
July 11, 2017 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James I. Cohn. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (lrz1)
July 11, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT) Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-9880524, filed by Trividia Healthcare Systems, LLC, Trividia Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-State Court Complaint)(Backman, Jeffrey) Modified exhibit text on 7/12/2017 (lrz1).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ARcare, Inc. v. Trividia Healthcare Systems, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trividia Healthcare Systems, LLC
Represented By: Roy Taub
Represented By: Jeffrey Aaron Backman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trividia Health, Inc.
Represented By: Roy Taub
Represented By: Jeffrey Aaron Backman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARcare, Inc.
Represented By: Randall K. Pulliam
Represented By: Louis I. Mussman
Represented By: Brian Tse-Hua Ku
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?