Navia v. Weiner

Appellee: Robin R. Weiner
Appellant: Oscar J. Navia
Case Number: 0:2018cv61747
Filed: July 30, 2018
Court: Florida Southern District Court
Office: Ft Lauderdale Office
County: Broward (Office: Ft Lauderdale)
Presiding Judge: K Michael Moore
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 21, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Appellant Brief due by 10/15/2018. per DE 8 (cbr)
September 21, 2018 8 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time #7 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time #7 is GRANTED. Appellant may file his initial brief on or before October 15, 2018. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 9/21/2018. (osk)
September 20, 2018 7 MOTION for Extension of Time To File Brief by Oscar J. Navia. Responses due by 10/4/2018 (cqs)
August 21, 2018 6 Bankruptcy Notice of Entry pursuant to Rule 8018 and NOTICE TO ATTORNEY - Pursuant to the Southern District of Florida Local Rules, and the Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Appellant has 30 days after the docketing of the Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court to serve and file a brief. The Appellee shall serve and file a response brief within 30 days after service of Appellant's brief. The Appellant shall serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the Appelle's brief. Appellant Brief due by 9/20/2018. (jc)
August 21, 2018 5 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Records to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Oscar J. Navia (Attachments: #1 Appellant Designation, #2 Docket Sheet)(mfe)
July 30, 2018 4 Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (jua)
July 30, 2018 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge K. Michael Moore. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jua)
July 30, 2018 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Oscar J. Navia (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Docket Sheet)(mfe)
July 30, 2018 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 18-13112, filed by Oscar J. Navia.(mfe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Navia v. Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Robin R. Weiner
Represented By: Robin R. Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Oscar J. Navia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?