Floridablanca, S.A. v. NZG Specialties, Inc.
Plaintiff: Floridablanca, S.A.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: NZG Specialties, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: Agricorp USA Inc.
Case Number: 0:2018cv61940
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Ft Lauderdale Office
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Referring Judge: Lurana S Snow
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 0499
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by NZG Specialties, Inc. re #4 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, filed by NZG Specialties, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Barmat, Marc)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Gregory Brown. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/10/2018. See attached document for full details. (lk)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Gregory Brown. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11060185 by NZG Specialties, Inc.. Responses due by 10/23/2018 (Barmat, Marc)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Agricorp USA Inc., COUNTERCLAIM against Floridablanca, S.A. by NZG Specialties, Inc.. Attorney Marc Philip Barmat added to party NZG Specialties, Inc.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Summon(s))(Barmat, Marc)
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to NZG Specialties, Inc.. (ail)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ail)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NZG SPECIALTIES, INC., d/b/a GOURMET TRADING, INC.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10919681, filed by Floridablanca, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Goldman, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Floridablanca, S.A. v. NZG Specialties, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floridablanca, S.A.
Represented By: Robert Eric Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: NZG Specialties, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Brown
Represented By: Marc Philip Barmat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Agricorp USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?