MacAlpine v. CRA Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: JAIME MACALPHINE, Janelle Mack, Jaime MacAlpine and Kimberlee Ruszkiewicz
Defendant: CRA SOLUTIONS, INC.
Case Number: 0:2018cv61986
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James I Cohn
Referring Judge: Barry S Seltzer
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Filing 26 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by CRA Solutions, Inc.. (Donnelly, Paul)
October 10, 2018 Filing 25 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on #5 Order Referring Case to Mediation into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Marlene Quintana. (Donnelly, Paul)
October 9, 2018 Filing 24 Clerks Notice to Filer re #22 Notice (Other). Parties/Mediator Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties/Mediator and add the mediator. AND Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The correct event is Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing. (ls)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #19 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Select a Mediator. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 10/9/18. (jsb)
October 8, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE by CRA Solutions, Inc. re #5 Order Referring Case to Mediation Selection of Mediator (Donnelly, Paul)
October 2, 2018 Filing 21 Defendant's RESPONSE to #10 Statement by CRA Solutions, Inc.. (Donnelly, Paul)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #13 Motion to Dismiss. In light of #18 Defendant's Notice, the Motion to Dismiss for ineffective service is denied as moot. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 10/2/18. (jsb)
September 28, 2018 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Select Mediator re #5 Order Referring Case to Mediation by CRA Solutions, Inc.. Responses due by 10/12/2018 (Donnelly, Paul)
September 28, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE by CRA Solutions, Inc. re #13 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, Quash Service and to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process that Motion is Moot (Donnelly, Paul) Modified Text on 10/1/2018 (ls).
September 28, 2018 Filing 17 Clerks Notice to Filer re #15 Summons Returned Executed. Incorrect Party Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the incorrect party for service. The correction was made by the Clerk and filing was re-docketed, see [de#16]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls)
September 27, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Jaime MacAlpine, Janelle Mack. CRA Solutions, Inc. served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (ls)(See Image at DE #15)
September 27, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Jaime MacAlpine. Jaime MacAlpine served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (Storch, Noah)
September 24, 2018 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by CRA Solutions, Inc. (Donnelly, Paul)
September 17, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, Quash Service and to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process by CRA Solutions, Inc.. Attorney Paul Andrew Donnelly added to party CRA Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft). Responses due by 10/1/2018 (Donnelly, Paul)
September 12, 2018 Filing 12 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): KIMBERLEE RUSZKIEWICZ. (Storch, Noah)
September 12, 2018 Filing 11 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Janelle Mack. (Storch, Noah)
September 11, 2018 Filing 10 Statement of: Claim by JAIME MACALPHINE (Storch, Noah)
September 10, 2018 Filing 9 Clerks Notice to Filer re #7 Notice of Consent to Join, #8 Notice of Consent to Join. Parties Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties and add the additional parties. (pes)
September 7, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of JAIME MACALPHINE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to join) (Storch, Noah)
September 7, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Noah E Storch on behalf of JAIME MACALPHINE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to join) (Storch, Noah)
August 27, 2018 Filing 6 Notice of Court Practice in FLSA Cases. Signed by Senior Judge James I. Cohn on 8/27/2018. See attached document for full details. (ls)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Senior Judge James I. Cohn on 8/27/2018. See attached document for full details. (ls)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 3/11/2019 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Senior Judge James I. Cohn., Calendar Call set for 3/7/2019 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Senior Judge James I. Cohn.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer for Discovery Matters. Signed by Senior Judge James I. Cohn on 8/27/2018. See attached document for full details. (ls) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
August 23, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CRA SOLUTIONS, INC.. (lh)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James I. Cohn. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (lh)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CRA SOLUTIONS, INC.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10932088, filed by JAIME MACALPHINE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent to Become Party Plaintiff, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s))(Storch, Noah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MacAlpine v. CRA Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRA SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By: Paul Andrew Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAIME MACALPHINE
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Represented By: Richard Bernard Celler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janelle Mack
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime MacAlpine
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Represented By: Richard Bernard Celler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberlee Ruszkiewicz
Represented By: Noah E Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?