Thompson v. Y & M 18, LLC

Appellant: Michael A. Thompson
Appellee: Y & M 18, LLC
Case Number: 0:2018cv62124
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: Florida Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2018 9 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Initial Brief by November 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
November 5, 2018 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Initial Brief by Michael A. Thompson. Attorney George Leo Zinkler, III added to party Michael A. Thompson(pty:a). Responses due by 11/19/2018 (Zinkler, George)
October 10, 2018 7 Bankruptcy Notice of Entry pursuant to Rule 8018 and NOTICE TO ATTORNEY - Pursuant to the Southern District of Florida Local Rules, and the Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Appellant has 30 days after the docketing of the Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court to serve and file a brief. The Appellee shall serve and file a response brief within 30 days after service of Appellant's brief. The Appellant shall serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the Appelle's brief. Appellant Brief due by 11/9/2018. (jc)
October 10, 2018 6 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Michael A. Thompson (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Designation - Appellant, #3 Designation - Appellee)(smd)
September 17, 2018 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael S. Hoffman on behalf of Y & M 18, LLC (Hoffman, Michael)
September 10, 2018 4 Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (bb)
September 10, 2018 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb)
September 10, 2018 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Notice of Appeal re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Michael A. Thompson (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(smd)
September 10, 2018 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 13-26507-RBR, filed by Michael A. Thompson.(smd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Y & M 18, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Michael A. Thompson
Represented By: Craig Pugatch
Represented By: David William Langley
Represented By: George Leo Zinkler, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Y & M 18, LLC
Represented By: Michael S. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?