Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe, subscriber IP address 104.186.72.163

Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 104.186.72.163 and IP address 104.186.72.163
Case Number: 0:2018cv62133
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: Florida Southern District Court
0 Judge: James I Cohn
1 Judge: Barry S Seltzer
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 7 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to Serve Third-Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(DeMaria, Joseph)
September 13, 2018 Reset Hearings Calendar Call set for 5/9/2019 09:00 AM before Senior Judge James I. Cohn. per Order #6 (mr1)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order 6 ORDER SETTING CALENDAR CALL AND TRIAL DATE, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE FOR SCHEDULING MATTERS AND PRETRIAL DISCOVERY MATTERS: (Jury Trial set for 5/13/2019 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Senior Judge James I. Cohn., Calendar Call set for 5/9/2018 09:00 AM before Senior Judge James I. Cohn.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer for for appropriate disposition of a1I pro hac vice motions, and all pretrial discovery motions, and all motions that relate directly to these motions, such as motions for extension of time, motions for reconsideration, motions for sanctions, and motions for mental or physical examinations. Signed by Senior Judge James I. Cohn on 9/11/2018. See attached document for full details. (jas)
September 11, 2018 5 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (DeMaria, Joseph)
September 11, 2018 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent GENERAL MEDIA SYSTEMS, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (DeMaria, Joseph)
September 11, 2018 3 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Exhibits) (jas)
September 11, 2018 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James I. Cohn. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jas)
September 11, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 104.186.72.163, an individual. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10983674, filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(DeMaria, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe, subscriber IP address 104.186.72.163
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Joseph A. DeMaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 104.186.72.163
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IP address 104.186.72.163
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?