JORDAN v. STATE OF FLORIDA
Plaintiff: DWAYNE JORDAN
Defendant: STATE OF FLORIDA
Case Number: 0:2018cv62231
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patrick A White
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against STATE OF FLORIDA filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by DWAYNE JORDAN.(mee)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REQUIRING PAYMENT OF FILING FEE OR FILING OF MOTION TO PROCEED IFP WITH DETAILED AFFIDAVIT. Filing Fee due by 10/22/2018. Motions due by 10/22/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 9/24/2018. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (fbn)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING NON-COMPLIANCE AND FOR AMENDED PETITION on or before October 22, 2018, Petitioner shall file a final, amended 2254 motion that complies with the applicable rules of procedure set forth in this order. ( Amended Complaint due by 10/22/2018 ) Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 9/24/2018. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 2254 Complaint Form) (fbn)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 9/24/2018. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
September 20, 2018 Filing 6 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams and Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2003-19, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (jua)
September 20, 2018 Filing 5 Case transferred in from Florida Northern; Case Number 4:18-cv-00438. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(jua).
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. The clerk of court is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida for all further proceedings. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 9/20/2018. (sdw)
September 17, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (sdw)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se litigant DWAYNE JORDAN. (sdw)
September 17, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DWAYNE JORDAN. (sdw)
September 17, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by DWAYNE JORDAN. (no service copies) (sdw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JORDAN v. STATE OF FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF FLORIDA
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Broward and North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DWAYNE JORDAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?