Johnson v. People's Trust Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Alexander Johnson
Defendant: People's Trust Insurance Company
Case Number: 0:2018cv62317
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Filing 11 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Alexander Johnson (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Joint Scheduling Report)(Dinin, Scott)
October 23, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by People's Trust Insurance Company. (Partlow, Stephanie)
October 23, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #5 Order to Show Cause by Alexander Johnson. (Dinin, Scott)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant SHALL FILE its response to Plaintiff's Complaint by October 23, 2018. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/22/2018. See attached document for full details. (mc)
October 22, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Alexander Johnson. People's Trust Insurance Company served on 10/1/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Dinin, Scott)
October 19, 2018 Filing 6 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by People's Trust Insurance Company. Attorney Stephanie Barr Partlow added to party People's Trust Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Partlow, Stephanie)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 10/23/2018. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/19/2018. See attached document for full details. (mc)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, ( Joint Scheduling Report due by 11/16/2018, Scheduling Conference set for 11/30/2018 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro.) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/16/2018. See attached document for full details. (ra)
September 28, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to People's Trust Insurance Company. (cbr)
September 28, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cbr)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11033151, filed by Alexander Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Dinin, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. People's Trust Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: People's Trust Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephanie Barr Partlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Johnson
Represented By: Scott Richard Dinin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?