Berkley Vacation Resorts, Inc. v. Sussman
Plaintiff: Berkley Vacation Resorts, Inc., Vacation Village at Bonaventure Owners Association, Inc., Lando Resorts Corporation, Palm Beach Shores Resort and Vacation Villas Association, Inc., Palm Beach Resort Development Group, LLC, Vacation Village at Weston Owners Association, Inc., Williamsburg Plantation, Inc., The Cliffs at Peace Canyon Owners Association, Eldorado Resorts Corp., Patriot Suites, Inc., Williamsburg Plantation Owners Association, Vacation Village at Parkway Owners Association, Inc., The Colonies Owners Association, Mizner Place at Weston Town Center Owners Association, Inc., Berkshire Mountain Lodge Owners Association, Inc. and Grandview at Las Vegas Owners Association, Inc.
Defendant: Mitchell Reed Sussman
Case Number: 0:2018cv62372
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION to Set Aside Default and Reinstate by Mitchell Reed Sussman. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Feinstein, Michael)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE CASE following #14 Clerk's Entry of Default as to Defendant Mitchell Reed Sussman. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 11/7/2018. See attached document for full details. (km02)
November 7, 2018 Civil Case Terminated. Closing Case. (km02)
November 6, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Laurence Feinstein on behalf of Mitchell Reed Sussman (Feinstein, Michael)
November 6, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Laurence Feinstein on behalf of Mitchell Reed Sussman. Attorney Michael Laurence Feinstein added to party Mitchell Reed Sussman(pty:dft). (Feinstein, Michael)
November 2, 2018 Filing 15 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re 13 Clerks Entry/Non-Entry of Default. Correction Clerks Entry of Default Entered in Error as to Berkley Vacation Resorts, Inc. Document Restricted and Modified. (kpe)
November 2, 2018 Filing 14 Clerks Entry of Default as to Mitchell Reed Sussman Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 11/2/2018. (kpe)
November 2, 2018 Filing 12 Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Mitchell Reed Sussman by Berkley Vacation Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hirschberg, Jennifer)
October 31, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Palm Beach Resort Development Group, LLC, Lando Resorts Corporation, Berkshire Mountain Lodge Owners Association, Inc., Williamsburg Plantation Owners Association, Mizner Place at Weston Town Center Owners Association, Inc., Patriot Suites, Inc., The Colonies Owners Association, Williamsburg Plantation, Inc., Vacation Village at Weston Owners Association, Inc., Berkley Vacation Resorts, Inc., Palm Beach Shores Resort and Vacation Villas Association, Inc., Vacation Village at Bonaventure Owners Association, Inc., Eldorado Resorts Corp., Grandview at Las Vegas Owners Association, Inc., Vacation Village at Parkway Owners Association, Inc., The Cliffs at Peace Canyon Owners Association. Mitchell Reed Sussman served on 10/11/2018, answer due 11/1/2018. (Hirschberg, Jennifer)
October 8, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Berkley Vacation Resorts, Inc., Berkshire Mountain Lodge Owners Association, Inc., Eldorado Resorts Corp., Grandview at Las Vegas Owners Association, Inc., Lando Resorts Corporation, Mizner Place at Weston Town Center Owners Association, Inc., Palm Beach Resort Development Group, LLC, Palm Beach Shores Resort and Vacation Villas Association, Inc., Patriot Suites, Inc., The Cliffs at Peace Canyon Owners Association, The Colonies Owners Association, Vacation Village at Bonaventure Owners Association, Inc., Vacation Village at Parkway Owners Association, Inc., Vacation Village at Weston Owners Association, Inc., Williamsburg Plantation Owners Association, Williamsburg Plantation, Inc. (Backman, Jeffrey)
October 5, 2018 Filing 9 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on #1 Complaint,, into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Eldorado Resorts Corp., Lando Resorts Corporation, Williamsburg Plantation, Inc., Palm Beach Resort Development Group, LLC, Patriot Suites, Inc., Vacation Village at Parkway Owners Association, Inc., Grandview at Las Vegas Owners Association, Inc., The Cliffs at Peace Canyon Owners Association, Inc., Williamsburg Plantation Owners Association, Mizner Place at Weston Town Center Owners Association, Inc., Palm Beach Shores Resort and Vacation Villas Association, Inc., Berkshire Mountain Lodge Owners Association, Inc., The Colonies Owners Association, Vacation Village at Bonaventure Owners Association, Inc. and Vacation Village at Weston Owners Association, Inc.. (Hirschberg, Jennifer)
October 5, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Berkley Vacation Resorts, Inc. for property located at Osceola County (Hirschberg, Jennifer)
October 4, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Berkley Vacation Resorts, Inc. for property located at Osceola (Hirschberg, Jennifer)
October 4, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Berkley Vacation Resorts, Inc. for property located at Palm Beach (Hirschberg, Jennifer)
October 4, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Berkley Vacation Resorts, Inc. for property located at Broward (Hirschberg, Jennifer)
October 4, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Mitchell Reed Sussman. (lh)
October 4, 2018 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Parties Not Added. The Filer failed to add all parties associated with the case.Filer is instructed to add the additional parties by filing a Notice of Entry of Parties. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (lh)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (lh)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mitchell Reed Sussman. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11050732, filed by Berkley Vacation Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Composite Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit Composite Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Composite Exhibit Q, #18 Civil Cover Sheet, #19 Summon(s))(Hirschberg, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berkley Vacation Resorts, Inc. v. Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berkley Vacation Resorts, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Brooke Hirschberg
Represented By: Jeffrey Aaron Backman
Represented By: Richard Wayne Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vacation Village at Bonaventure Owners Association, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Aaron Backman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lando Resorts Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey Aaron Backman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Palm Beach Shores Resort and Vacation Villas Association, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Aaron Backman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Palm Beach Resort Development Group, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Aaron Backman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vacation Village at Weston Owners Association, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Aaron Backman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Williamsburg Plantation, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Aaron Backman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Cliffs at Peace Canyon Owners Association
Represented By: Jeffrey Aaron Backman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eldorado Resorts Corp.
Represented By: Jeffrey Aaron Backman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patriot Suites, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Aaron Backman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Williamsburg Plantation Owners Association
Represented By: Jeffrey Aaron Backman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vacation Village at Parkway Owners Association, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Aaron Backman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Colonies Owners Association
Represented By: Jeffrey Aaron Backman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mizner Place at Weston Town Center Owners Association, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Aaron Backman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berkshire Mountain Lodge Owners Association, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Aaron Backman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grandview at Las Vegas Owners Association, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Aaron Backman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Reed Sussman
Represented By: Michael Laurence Feinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?