Pinero v. HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.
Plaintiff: Emilio Pinero
Defendant: HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.
Case Number: 0:2018cv62653
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Referring Judge: Barry S Seltzer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12182
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 12/28/2018. See attached document for full details. (jao)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 10/28/2019 before Judge Darrin P. Gayles., Calendar Call set for 10/23/2019 09:30 AM before Judge Darrin P. Gayles., Status Conference set for 7/10/2019 10:00 AM before Judge Darrin P. Gayles.), REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer for Discovery Matters, REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 6/21/2019.) Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 12/27/2018. See attached document for full details. (jao) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
December 14, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Compliance by HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. re 5 Notice of Court Practice,,,, (Bellido, Nelson)
December 12, 2018 Filing 9 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Emilio Pinero (Wassenberg, Lauren)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Pursuant to S.D. Fla. Local Rule 16.1, on or before December 12, 2018, the parties shall prepare and file a Joint Scheduling Report, as well as Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements.The parties shall also file a Proposed Scheduling Order, adhering to the format and guidance of the attached form. If the parties deviate in any way from that format and guidance, they shall contemporaneously submit a written explanation, which provides their purported justification for each and every deviation. If the parties fail to submit such written explanation, the Court may enter a Scheduling Order that does not take into account the parties' proposed dates.Failure to comply with this Order shall be grounds for dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles See attached document for full details. (lfn)
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. identifying Other Affiliate The Home Depot, Inc. for HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. (Bellido, Nelson)
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.. Attorney Nelson Camilo Bellido added to party HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.(pty:dft). (Bellido, Nelson)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. The Complaint in this action is filed under the Americans with Disabilities Act (ADA), 42 U.S.C. 12181 et seq. In order to assist the Court in the management of this case, and in an effort to foster early and cost-effective resolution, the parties are ORDERED as follows: Within fourteen (14) days of service of the Complaint, Defendant shall file a report with the Court indicating whether it intends to remediate the deficiencies identified in the Complaint and agrees to pay reasonable attorneys fees in connection with this action, as determined by the Court or agreement of the parties. If so, Defendant shall include a timeline for remediation. If, upon review of the report, the Court finds that Defendant intends to remediate the property in a timely manner, the Court will administratively close the case pending remediation. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lfn)
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lfn)
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.. (jao)
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11129066, filed by Emilio Pinero. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Wassenberg, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pinero v. HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.
Represented By: Nelson Camilo Bellido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emilio Pinero
Represented By: Lauren Nicole Wassenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?