Fiander et al v. CBS Corporation, et al
Plaintiff: CLIFFORD FIANDER and LYNDA FIANDER
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corp., Crane Co., CBS Corporation and Crane Pumps & System, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2018cv62844
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James I Cohn
Referring Judge: Barry S Seltzer
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference will be re-set by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 12/17/2018. (pb00)
December 13, 2018 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by CBS Corporation, Foster Wheeler Energy Corp.. Responses due by 12/27/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Collings, Christopher)
December 6, 2018 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Pumps & System, Inc. (McGuinness, Stephen)
December 6, 2018 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Co. (McGuinness, Stephen)
December 5, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen Allan McGuinness on behalf of Crane Co., Crane Pumps & System, Inc.. Attorney Stephen Allan McGuinness added to party Crane Co.(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen Allan McGuinness added to party Crane Pumps & System, Inc.(pty:dft). (McGuinness, Stephen)
December 5, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William John Simonitsch on behalf of Crane Co., Crane Pumps & System, Inc.. Attorney William John Simonitsch added to party Crane Co.(pty:dft), Attorney William John Simonitsch added to party Crane Pumps & System, Inc.(pty:dft). (Simonitsch, William)
December 3, 2018 Filing 10 SUGGESTION OF DEATH as to Plaintiff, Clifford Fiander by CLIFFORD FIANDER, LYNDA FIANDER (Vinocur, Rebecca)
December 3, 2018 Filing 9 SUGGESTION OF DEATH as to Plaintiff, Clifford Fiander by CLIFFORD FIANDER, LYNDA FIANDER (Vinocur, Rebecca)
November 28, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Foster Wheeler Energy Corp. (Collings, Christopher)
November 28, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher J. M. Collings on behalf of Foster Wheeler Energy Corp.. Attorney Christopher J. M. Collings added to party Foster Wheeler Energy Corp.(pty:dft). (Collings, Christopher)
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS Corporation (Collings, Christopher)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 12/18/2018 at 02:00 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 11/27/2018. See attached document for full details. (pb00)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING CALENDAR CALL AND TRIAL DATE: ( Jury Trial set for 7/29/2019 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Senior Judge James I. Cohn., Calendar Call set for 7/25/2019 09:00 AM before Senior Judge James I. Cohn), and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer for Scheduling Matters and Pretrial Discovery Matters. Signed by Senior Judge James I. Cohn on 11/26/2018. See attached document for full details. (ar2) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by CBS Corporation Notice of Filing Exhibit E and F (Collings, Christopher)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James I. Cohn. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jas)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint and Demand For Jury Trial) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11181068, filed by CBS CORPORATION f/k/a VIACOM, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Collings, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fiander et al v. CBS Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corp.
Represented By: Christopher J. M. Collings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: William John Simonitsch
Represented By: Stephen Allan McGuinness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Christopher J. M. Collings
Represented By: Erin E. Dardis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Pumps & System, Inc.
Represented By: William John Simonitsch
Represented By: Stephen Allan McGuinness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLIFFORD FIANDER
Represented By: Rebecca Shull Vinocur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LYNDA FIANDER
Represented By: Rebecca Shull Vinocur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?