Lopez Ortiz v. Whitaker et al
Petitioner: Pedro Lopez Ortiz
Respondent: Juan Agudelo, Interim Attorney Gen Matthew Whitaker, Secretary Kirstjen Michele Nielsen, Acting Director Ronald D. Vitiello and Field Director Marc J. Moore
Case Number: 0:2018cv63049
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Referring Judge: Lurana S Snow
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by Pedro Lopez Ortiz (Prada, Mark)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony Erickson-Pogorzelski on behalf of Juan Agudelo, Marc J. Moore, Kirstjen Michele Nielsen, Ronald D. Vitiello, Matthew Whitaker. Attorney Anthony Erickson-Pogorzelski added to party Juan Agudelo(pty:res), Attorney Anthony Erickson-Pogorzelski added to party Marc J. Moore(pty:res), Attorney Anthony Erickson-Pogorzelski added to party Kirstjen Michele Nielsen(pty:res), Attorney Anthony Erickson-Pogorzelski added to party Ronald D. Vitiello(pty:res), Attorney Anthony Erickson-Pogorzelski added to party Matthew Whitaker(pty:res). (Erickson-Pogorzelski, Anthony)
December 14, 2018 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Noticing INS Attorney added. (mf)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING EXPEDITED RESPONSE. Responses due by 1/9/2019, Replies due by 1/16/2019. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 12/14/2018. See attached document for full details. (lbc)
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Juan Agudelo, Marc J. Moore, Kirstjen Michele Nielsen, Ronald D. Vitiello, Matthew Whitaker, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (cds)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. (cds)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 . Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number 113C-11239677, filed by Pedro Lopez Ortiz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix Volume 1, #3 Appendix Volume 2, #4 Motion for Order to Show Cause and to Expedite, #5 Summon(s))(Prada, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez Ortiz v. Whitaker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Juan Agudelo
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Anthony Erickson-Pogorzelski
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Interim Attorney Gen Matthew Whitaker
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Anthony Erickson-Pogorzelski
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary Kirstjen Michele Nielsen
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Anthony Erickson-Pogorzelski
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Acting Director Ronald D. Vitiello
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Anthony Erickson-Pogorzelski
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Field Director Marc J. Moore
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Anthony Erickson-Pogorzelski
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pedro Lopez Ortiz
Represented By: Mark Andrew Prada
Represented By: Felix Alberto Montanez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?