Ratoo v. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Plaintiff: Kevin Ratoo
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Case Number: 0:2018cv63109
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: Florida Southern District Court
0 Judge: Beth Bloom
1 Judge: Alicia O Valle
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order 22 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Closing Case. Motions terminated: #11 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., #18 MOTION to Remand filed by Kevin Ratoo. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
January 23, 2019 21 STIPULATION of Dismissal {Joint Stipulation for Final Order of Dismissal} by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Ingalls, Andrew)
January 22, 2019 20 NOTICE by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. re #11 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), /BANA's Notice of Filing Mistakenly Omitted Exhibit (Ingalls, Andrew)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order 19 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Amended Pleadings due by 3/20/2019., Discovery due by 7/30/2019., Fact Discovery due by 7/30/2019., Expert Discovery due by 7/30/2019., Joinder of Parties due by 3/20/2019., Mediation Deadline 8/13/2019., In Limine Motions due by 8/21/2019., Dispositive Motions due by 8/21/2019., Motions due by 8/21/2019., Pretrial Stipulation due by 11/12/2019., Jury Trial set for 11/25/2019 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 11/19/2019 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 8/13/2019.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
January 18, 2019 18 MOTION to Remand by Kevin Ratoo. (Leshin, Randall)
January 18, 2019 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by Kevin Ratoo. Replies due by 1/25/2019. (Leshin, Randall)
January 17, 2019 16 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Ingalls, Andrew)
January 17, 2019 15 Election to Jurisdiction for Final Disposition of Motions . Filed by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Ingalls, Andrew)
January 17, 2019 14 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ingalls, Andrew)
January 14, 2019 Reset Deadlines Per DE#13. Joint Scheduling Report due by 1/17/2019 (cqs)
January 12, 2019 Opinion or Order 13 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #12 Motion to Stay. The parties shall comply with the Court's Order, ECF No. #3 , requiring the parties to prepare and file a joint scheduling report, no later than January 17, 2019. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
January 8, 2019 12 MOTION to Stay re #3 Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines, by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.. Responses due by 1/22/2019 (Ingalls, Andrew)
January 4, 2019 11 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.. Responses due by 1/18/2019 (Ingalls, Andrew)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Jeremy M. Weintraub. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Beth L. Kaufman. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
December 27, 2018 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jeremy M. Weintraub. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11271280 by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.. Responses due by 1/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ingalls, Andrew)
December 27, 2018 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Beth L. Kaufman. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11271220 by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.. Responses due by 1/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ingalls, Andrew)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to Complaint by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.. Response/Answer due by 1/4/2019. Re: #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
December 26, 2018 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ingalls, Andrew)
December 21, 2018 4 NOTICE by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. re #3 Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines, Notice of Filing State Court Docket (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Ingalls, Andrew)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order 3 ORDER ON POST-REMOVAL PROCEDURES, AND REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Responses due by 12/27/2018. Deadline 1/3/2019., Joint Scheduling Report due by 1/10/2019., Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/20/2018. See attached document for full details. (lbc)
December 19, 2018 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
December 19, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11256749, filed by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Ingalls, Andrew)Text Modified on 12/20/2018 (cds). No Answer/Motion To Dismiss Filed.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ratoo v. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Represented By: Andrew Robert Ingalls
Represented By: Marc Jonathan Gottlieb
Represented By: William Patrick Heller
Represented By: Beth L. Kaufman
Represented By: Jeremy M. Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Ratoo
Represented By: Randall Leigh Leshin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?