W.P. Productions, Inc. v. Tramontina U.S.A., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: W.P. Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Sam's West, Inc. and Tramontina U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 0:2018cv63162
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James I Cohn
Referring Judge: Barry S Seltzer
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 3/12/2019 at 02:00 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 2/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (pb00)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Tramontina U.S.A., Inc. of Appearance. Attorney Gregg Darrow Thomas added to party Tramontina U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft). (Thomas, Gregg)
February 22, 2019 Reset Deadlines Sam's West, Inc. answer due 3/25/2019; Tramontina U.S.A., Inc. answer due 3/25/2019 Per DE#7. (cqs)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant shall have until 3/25/2019 to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Senior Judge James I. Cohn on 2/22/2019. (slr)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Tramontina U.S.A., Inc.. Attorney James J. McGuire added to party Tramontina U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order granting requested relief)(McGuire, James)
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Sam's West, Inc., Tramontina U.S.A., Inc.. (kpe)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by W.P. Productions, Inc. re #1 Complaint filed by W.P. Productions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Sam's West, Inc., #2 Summon(s) Tramontina U.S.A., Inc.) (Wagner, Scott)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER SETTING CALENDAR CALL AND TRIAL DATE, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE FOR SCHEDULING MATTERS AND PRETRIAL DISCOVERY MATTERS: ( Jury Trial set for 9/3/2019 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Senior Judge James I. Cohn., Calendar Call set for 8/29/2019 09:00 AM before Senior Judge James I. Cohn.) Signed by Senior Judge James I. Cohn on 1/7/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James I. Cohn. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (kpe)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11273244, filed by W.P. Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wagner, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: W.P. Productions, Inc. v. Tramontina U.S.A., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's West, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tramontina U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Gregg Darrow Thomas
Represented By: James J. McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W.P. Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Andrew Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?