Caplan v. HARRY P. STAMPLER, INC. et al

Plaintiff: Howard Michael Caplan
Defendant: HARRY P. STAMPLER, INC. and MICHEL SHLIMOWITZ
Case Number: 0:2019cv60091
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
0 Judge: James I Cohn
1 Judge: Barry S Seltzer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Howard Michael Caplan. MICHEL SHLIMOWITZ served on 2/9/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Stern, Ronald)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING CALENDAR CALL AND TRIAL DATE, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE FOR SCHEDULING MATTERS AND PRETRIAL DISCOVERY MATTERS: Calendar Call set for 9/12/2019 at 9:00 AM before Senior Judge James I. Cohn., Jury Trial set for 9/16/2019 at 9:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Senior Judge James I. Cohn. Signed by Senior Judge James I. Cohn on 1/14/2019. See attached document for full details. (ail)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to HARRY P. STAMPLER, INC., MICHEL SHLIMOWITZ. (jao)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James I. Cohn. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11302143, filed by Howard Michael Caplan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(Stern, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caplan v. HARRY P. STAMPLER, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Michael Caplan
Represented By: Ronald E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARRY P. STAMPLER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHEL SHLIMOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?