Faruqui et al v. Brown

Appellee: Scott N. Brown
Appellant: Sabina Faruqui and Najmus Faruqui
Case Number: 0:2019cv60346
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Filing 12 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on January 22, 2019 before Judge John K. Olson, Volume Number 1 of 1, 1-18 pages, Court Reporter: Ouellette & Mauldin. Telephone number: 305-358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/2/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/26/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/24/2019. (mfe)
March 27, 2019 Filing 11 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on November 14, 2018 before Judge John K. Olson, Volume Number 1 of 1, 1-19 pages, Court Reporter: Ouellette & Mauldin. Telephone number: 305-358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/2/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/26/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/24/2019. (mfe)
March 27, 2019 Filing 10 Bankruptcy Notice of Entry pursuant to Rule 8018 and NOTICE TO ATTORNEY - Pursuant to the Southern District of Florida Local Rules, and the Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Appellant has 30 days after the docketing of the Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court to serve and file a brief. The Appellee shall serve and file a response brief within 30 days after service of Appellant's brief. The Appellant shall serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the Appelle's brief. Appellant Brief due by 4/26/2019. (jc)
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Sabina Faruqui, Najmus Faruqui (Attachments: #1 Amended Appellants Designation, #2 Docket Sheet)(mfe)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING CASE NO. 19-60347-CIV-MORENO without prejudice and ORDER Granting Leave to Amend the Appeal in Case No. 19-60346-CIV-MORENO. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (mmd)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE NO. 19-60348-CIV-MORENO WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND APPEAL IN THIS CASE NO. 19-60346. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (mmd)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Najmus Faruqui, Sabina Faruqui. Attorney Richard Bernard Storfer added to party Najmus Faruqui(pty:a), Attorney Richard Bernard Storfer added to party Sabina Faruqui(pty:a). Responses due by 3/18/2019 (Storfer, Richard)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Najmus Faruqui, Sabina Faruqui (Cirulnick, Riley)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (jua)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jua)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Notice of Appeal re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Sabina Faruqui, Najmus Faruqui (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(smd)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 18-01344-JKO, filed by Sabina Faruqui, Najmus Faruqui.(smd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faruqui et al v. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Scott N. Brown
Represented By: Zakarij Neil Laux
Represented By: Scott Neil Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Sabina Faruqui
Represented By: Riley W. Cirulnick
Represented By: Richard Bernard Storfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Najmus Faruqui
Represented By: Riley W. Cirulnick
Represented By: Richard Bernard Storfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?