Chhabra v. Brown

Appellee: Scott N. Brown
Appellant: Michael Chhabra
Case Number: 0:2019cv60348
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
0 Judge: Federico A Moreno
1 Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Filing 11 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re 10 Order Dismissing Case,. Document Restricted Due to Error; The correct document has been attached to this notice. (Original document re-scanned due to poor quality of image/per chambers) (mno)
March 26, 2019 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 10 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (mno)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Federico A. Moreno for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 3/15/2019. Judge Ursula Ungaro no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 3/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (km02)
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Michael Chhabra. Responses due by 3/18/2019 (Cirulnick, Riley)
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Michael Chhabra (Cirulnick, Riley)
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance re #5 Order Regarding Appellate Briefs, Record Transcripts, And Requests For Oral Argument (Mailed copies of Order to the parties attorneys at the addresses listed on the docket. ) (vmz)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Regarding Appellate Briefs, Record Transcripts, And Requests For Oral Argument re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Michael Chhabra Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 2/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (jc)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro and Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Notice of Appeal re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Michael Chhabra (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(smd)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 18-01344-JKO, filed by Michael Chhabra.(smd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chhabra v. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Scott N. Brown
Represented By: Scott Neil Brown
Represented By: Zakarij Neil Laux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Michael Chhabra
Represented By: Riley W. Cirulnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?